Chu, William (CPSO#: 79673)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4982
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough Hospital (General)
3050 Lawrence Ave. E.
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Chu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Chu ( CPSO# 79673 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology T2-175
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4982

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2009