Chua, Caroline Lee-Ming (CPSO#: 91180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Towne Centre Medical Clinic
Suite 201
3601 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 0M3
Phone: (905) 604-3336
Fax: (905) 604-7750
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caroline Chua Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chua ( CPSO# 91180 )

Business Address:
Towne Centre Medical Clinic
201 - 3601 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 0M3
Phone Number: (905) 604-3336

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE LEE-MING CHUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 02 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2011