Chua, Soo Yong (CPSO#: 92016)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Singapore, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2009 to 08 Nov 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 09 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010