Chuang, Ching Chu (CPSO#: 24260)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Taiwanese

Education:Kaohsiung Medical College, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. 1 High Meadow Pl North York, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 30 Apr 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: November 1, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)