Chuang, Nathaniel Ai-Hsi (CPSO#: 76789)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 14 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Univ of California, San Francisco, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2005