Chuang, Sylvester Ho-Sum (CPSO#: 27267)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5477
Fax: (416) 813-5471
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYLVESTER HO-SUM CHUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1977