Chudasama, Siddharajsinh Jayvantsinh (CPSO#: 87096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 2C4
Phone: 905-515-8634
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Chudasama Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chudasama ( CPSO# 87096 )

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
1960 Appleby Line
Suite 32
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 335-1888

Business Address:
4610 Highway 7 West
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIDDHARAJSINH JAYVANTSINH CHUDASAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUDASAMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 May 2011 to 30 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 May 2012 to 30 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2013 to 28 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2011