Chugh, Taher (CPSO#: 84794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Enhanced Care Clinic
14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Phone: (905) 841-8790
Fax: (905) 841-9404
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7335 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 2B2
Canada
Phone: 905-707-7309
Fax: 888-979-6305
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chugh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chugh ( CPSO# 84794 )
Dr. M. Boulanger ( CPSO# 92868 )

Business Address:
14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Phone Number: (905) 505-0950

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAHER CHUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008