Chughtai, Talat Saeed (CPSO#: 78835)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Talat S. Chughtai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 17 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2012