Chuhan, Yadwinder Singh (CPSO#: 90957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Postgraduate Residency Program
Hotel Dieu Hospital - Johnson 5
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: 613 544-3400 Ext. 2507
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King St
Trenton ON  K8V 3X3
Canada
Phone: (613) 392-2540
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Queen's University
Postgraduate Medical Education
70 Barrie St
Kingston ON  K7L3N6
Canada
Phone: (613) 533-2543
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

ACT Kingston
62 Division St
Kingston ON  K7L3M6
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-0228
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y. Chuhan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Chuhan ( CPSO# 90957 )

Business Address:
Cobourg/Northumberland Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone Number: (613) 392-2540

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 449-2445

Business Address:
Queen's University
70 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2132

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  May 18, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On June 18, 2018, Kingston Health Science Centre has been informed by Queen's University that Dr. Chuhan's suspension in the Psychiatry Residency Program has ended. Therefore, KHSC reinstated Dr. Chuhan's hospital privileges.

On May 23, 2018, the College was notified by Kingston Health Science Centre (KHSC) that Queen's University suspended Dr. Chuhan from their residency Psychiatry Program. Therefore, KHSC temporarily suspended Dr. Chuhan's hospital privileges.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YADWINDER SINGH CHUHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 07 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 08 Jul 2018 to 17 Nov 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 18 Nov 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011