Chunduri, Krishna Veni (CPSO#: 77307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu, Urdu

Education:Osmania University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
701 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone: (416) 221-0176
Fax: (416) 221-5418
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7160 Markham Road
Markham ON  L3S 3J8
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7400
Fax: (905) 472-9009
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

9500 Markham Road
Markham ON  L6E 0N6
Canada
Phone: (905) 201-1155
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Feb 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISHNA VENI CHUNDURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNDURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Feb 2002 to 18 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Feb 2003 to 18 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2004