Chung, Eric Kang Yuen (CPSO#: 92496)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Melbourne, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2010 to 26 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Mar 2010 to 01 Jan 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 2011