Chung, Han-Oh (CPSO#: 88782)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Han-Oh Chung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chung ( CPSO# 88782 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAN-OH CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2012