Chung, Justin Ch'in-Sheng (CPSO#: 97897)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Kingston Road
Unit 15
Pickering ON  L1V 6Z9
Phone: (905) 509-4595
Fax: (905) 509-4597
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lau Chung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lau ( CPSO# 97912 )
Dr. J. Chung ( CPSO# 97897 )

Business Address:
H336, H Wing 3rd Floor
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
15 - 300 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 6Z9
Phone Number: (905) 509-4595

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTIN CH'IN-SHENG CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014