Chung, Michael Hwoine (CPSO#: 69070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1997

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Emergency Medicine
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7200
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillilum Health Partners
Department of Emergency Medicine
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W. Mississauga
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4548
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael H. Chung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chung ( CPSO# 69070 )

Business Address:
The Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4530

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL HWOINE CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1997

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)