Chung, Peter Wai-Ming (CPSO#: 76790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-6522
Fax: (416) 946-2111
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Chung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chung ( CPSO# 76790 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-6522

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 14 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER WAI-MING CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2007