Chung, Seen Taek (CPSO#: 77332)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2002 to 07 Apr 2002
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2002 to 03 May 2002
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012