Church, Alanna Joyce (CPSO#: 84861)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Department of Pathology, Boston Children's Hospital, 300 Longwood Avenue, Boston, MA, USA, 02115
Date Received: 19 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 24 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015