Churchill, Paige Elizabeth (CPSO#: 92798)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1B9
Phone: (705) 549-3939
Fax: (705) 549-0029
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paige Churchill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Churchill ( CPSO# 92798 )

Business Address:
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1B8
Phone Number: (705) 549-3939

Business Address:
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAIGE ELIZABETH CHURCHILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHURCHILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015