Churchley, Lindsay Rebecca (CPSO#: 95464)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Port Arthur Health Centre
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-1000
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Ob/Gyn
Thunder Bay Regional HS Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: 807-684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDSAY REBECCA CHURCHLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHURCHLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016