Ciccotelli, William Anthony (CPSO#: 77583)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4348
Fax: (519) 749-4250
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ciccotelli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Ciccotelli ( CPSO# 77583 )

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6578

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
PO Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4348

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM ANTHONY CICCOTELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CICCOTELLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2007