Ciofani, Amelia (CPSO#: 86717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58597
Fax: (905) 494-6473
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

401-8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Canada
Phone: (905) 264-9991
Fax: 905-264-0085
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMELIA CIOFANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIOFANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2011