Clancy, Aisling Anne (CPSO#: 95188)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campu
Urogynecology Clinic
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 7388400 Ext. 81725
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AISLING ANNE CLANCY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLANCY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016