Clapham, Diane (CPSO#: 84704)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: Slosarz, Diane (used until: 27 Jul 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2921 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Toronto ON  M8V 1J3
Phone: (416) 252-3665
Fax: (416) 252-3815
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE CLAPHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLAPHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2013