Clark, Beverley Alfretta (CPSO#: 15076)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: Burgess, Beverley Alfretta Clark (used until: 18 Oct 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 May 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1994
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006