Clark, David Llewellyn (CPSO#: 78793)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:St Bartholomew's & The Royal London Scho, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 17 Mar 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 18 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003