Clark, Edward George (CPSO#: 87888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 prom. Riverside drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82569
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. G. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Baines ( CPSO# 96939 )
Dr. E. Clark ( CPSO# 87888 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital-Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 Prom. Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 789-5555

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Hospital
Schizophrenia Program
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD GEORGE CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2007