Clark, Heather Diane (CPSO#: 67263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Room D105
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-5164
Fax: (613) 761-4036
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather D. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Clark ( CPSO# 67263 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Room D105
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER DIANE CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1993