Clark, John Alexander (CPSO#: 59904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Rouge Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4S9
Phone: (416) 281-7021
Fax: (416) 281-7493
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Rouge Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2480
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: 905-683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Ellesmere X-Ray
2880 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B8
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-1697
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville, ON P1H 1H7
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Canada
Phone: (705) 789-0022
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John A. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Clark ( CPSO# 59904 )

Business Address:
2880 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 284-1697

Business Address:
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-0022

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
Scarborough Grace Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ALEXANDER CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1989