Clark, Laura Brigitte (CPSO#: 77957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: Loijens, Laura Brigitte (used until: 12 Jun 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Spadina Health Centre
404-720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2T9
Phone: (416) 928-0920
Fax: (416) 928-7426
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

825 Don Mills Road
Toronto ON  M4C 1V4
Canada
Phone: (416) 383-1251
Fax: (416) 383-6084
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Clark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Clark ( CPSO# 77957 )

Business Address:
825 Don Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3C 1V4
Phone Number: (416) 383-1251

Business Address:
Spadina Health Centre
404-720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2T9
Phone Number: (416) 928-0920

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA BRIGITTE CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004