Clark, Michael Lawrence (CPSO#: 84380)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Children`s Hospital of Eastern Ontario 401 Smyth Rd Ottawa, ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 01 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  April 30, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On April 30, 2018, Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario (CHEO) notified the College, pursuant to s. 85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective April 30, 2018, Dr. Michael Clark voluntarily resigned his privileges at CHEO.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 04 May 2010 to 03 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 04 May 2011 to 03 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 04 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018