Clarke, Amanda Lucy (CPSO#: 89879)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 17 Nov 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 18 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2010