Clarke, Blaise Alexander (CPSO#: 85366)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
11th Floor Eaton Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3396
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Blaise Alexander Clarke and Dr. Anna Marie Mulligan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Clarke ( CPSO# 85366 )
Dr. A. Mulligan ( CPSO# 81796 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
11th Floor Eaton Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3396

Business Address:
University Health Network
Laboratory Medicine Program
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 340-3072

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 15 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 19 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Blaise Alexander Clarke may practise medicine independently in anatomic
            pathology, only.