Clarke, Collin Franklin Murphy (CPSO#: 82905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Room C3 172
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: 5196858500 Ext. 18090
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Collin Clarke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Clarke ( CPSO# 82905 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Room C3 172
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLLIN FRANKLIN MURPHY CLARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2011