Clarke, Jo-Anne Marie (CPSO#: 79126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NE Specialized Geriatric Centre
960 Notre Dame Avenue Unit D
Sudbury ON  P3A 2T4
Phone: (705) 688-3970
Fax: (705) 688-7720
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jo-Anne Clarke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Clarke ( CPSO# 79126 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
NE Specialized Geriatric Services
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Unit D
Sudbury ON  P3A 2T4
Phone Number: (705) 688-3970

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre,Sudbury Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 28 Feb 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JO-ANNE MARIE CLARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2006 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2007