Clarke, Theresa-Ann (CPSO#: 67278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: Clarke Maharaj, Theresa-Ann (used until: 23 Apr 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
241 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J4
Phone: (519) 753-3310
Fax: (519) 753-7618
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

44 King St
Brantford ON  N3T 3C7
Canada
Phone: 519 752-2998
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

238 Grand River St N
Paris ON  N3L 2N7
Canada
Phone: 519 442-3609
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Theresa-Ann Clarke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Clarke ( CPSO# 67278 )

Business Address:
44 King Street
Brantford ON  N3T 3C7
Phone Number: (519) 752-2998

Business Address:
238 Grand River Street North
Brantford ON  N3T 2N7
Phone Number: (519) 442-3609

Business Address:
241 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 753-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THERESA-ANN CLARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1993 to 31 Mar 1994
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1993