Clase, Catherine Mary (CPSO#: 67344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6094
Fax: (905) 521-6153
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Clase Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Clase ( CPSO# 67344 )

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare Burlington Satellite Dialysis Ce
2160 Itabashi Way
Burlington ON  L7M 4J8
Phone Number: (905) 319-6572

Business Address:
Bayshore Centres
910 Queenston Road
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 662-0307

Business Address:
White Pines Wellness Centre
1745 Chiefswood Road
Ohsweken ON  N0A 1M0
Phone Number: (519) 445-2418

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6094

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 06 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARY CLASE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLASE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1993 to 03 Sep 1993
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2001