Clay, Jane Elizabeth (CPSO#: 84269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Omemee Medical Centre
Box 310
23 Wellington Street
Omemee ON  K0L 2W0
Phone: (705) 799-0000
Fax: (705) 799-0271
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE ELIZABETH CLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 07 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2010