Clayton, Cheryl Ann (CPSO#: 80680)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Kids Place
400 McKeown
North Bay ON  P1B 0B2
Phone: (705) 495-8115
Fax: (705) 495-8114
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cheryl Clayton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Clayton ( CPSO# 80680 )

Business Address:
One Kids Place
400 McKeown Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 0B2
Phone Number: (705) 495-8115

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mattawa General Hospital Mattawa
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERYL ANN CLAYTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLAYTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008