Cleary, Sean Patrick (CPSO#: 73892)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Cleary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Dept of General Surgery Rm 10216 Toronto General Hospital 200 Elizabeth St Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Date Received: 28 Jun 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2017