Clements-Baker, Marie Isobel (CPSO#: 84270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
94 Stuart St
Room 2067 Etherington Hall
Kingston ON  K7L 2V9
Phone: (905) 533-6604
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

95 Bayly St West
Suite 401
Ajax ON  L1S 7K9
Canada
Phone: (905) 427-2678
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clements-Baker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Clements-Baker ( CPSO# 84270 )

Business Address:
96 Bayly Street
Suite 401
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 427-2678

Business Address:
94 Stuart Street
Etherington Hall Room 2067
Kingston ON  K7L 2V9
Phone Number: (613) 533-6604

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE ISOBEL CLEMENTS-BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEMENTS-BAKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011