Clendinning, Eric William (CPSO#: 95312)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
140 Rolling Hills
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone: 519-941-7575
Fax: 519-941-7060
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Headwaters Health Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
Phone: (519) 941-2410
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clendinning and French Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. French ( CPSO# 95245 )
Dr. E. Clendinning ( CPSO# 95312 )

Business Address:
Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Upper Level
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone Number: (519) 941-7575

Business Address:
Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC WILLIAM CLENDINNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLENDINNING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2013