Coburn, Bryan Alexander (CPSO#: 88948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
101 College Street, Rm 10-358
M5G 1L7
Toronto ON  M5G 1L7
Phone: (416) 581-7457
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYAN ALEXANDER COBURN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COBURN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2012