Coburn, Natalie Suzanne Groce (CPSO#: 81634)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of North Carolina, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of General Surgery
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Coburn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Coburn ( CPSO# 81634 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite T2-102
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE SUZANNE GROCE COBURN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COBURN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2016