Cochrane, Lesley Ann (CPSO#: 73001)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Feb 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Feb 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 25 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Aug 1998 to 15 Sep 1998
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 08 Jan 2001 to 02 Feb 2001
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Feb 2001