Cockwell, Heather Anne (CPSO#: 77539)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
IWK Hospital
Dept. OB/GYN
Halifax NS  B3K 6R8
Phone: 902-470-7098
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Cockwell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cockwell ( CPSO# 77539 )

Business Address:
ONE Fertility
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone Number: (905) 634-4440

Business Address:
Suite A4
800 Southdown Road
Mississauga ON  L5J 2Y4
Phone Number: (905) 901-5123

Business Address:
NOH
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ANNE COCKWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COCKWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2009