Code, Catherine Christina (CPSO#: 72381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Internal Medicine
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Room D107B
1053 Carling Ave.
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4473
Fax: (613) 761-4186
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Code Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Code ( CPSO# 72381 )

Business Address:
Department of Internal Medicine
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
407B
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4473

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE CHRISTINA CODE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CODE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002