Coffey, Maitreya Son-Mey (CPSO#: 83764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Chicago, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Childern
Department of Pediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7938
Fax: (416) 813-5663
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAITREYA SON-MEY COFFEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COFFEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012