Coffey, Niamh (CPSO#: 96013)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-710
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIAMH COFFEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COFFEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2017