Cohen, Jeremy Isaac (CPSO#: 88783)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PACE Cardiology
Medical Arts Building
581 Davis Drive
Suite 602B
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 953-7917
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeremy I. Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bross ( CPSO# 88777 )
Dr. J. Cohen ( CPSO# 88783 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
PACE Cardiology Clinic
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 953-7917

Business Address:
PACE Cardiology Clinic
Units 21-23
117 Young Street
Alliston ON  L9R 0E9
Phone Number: (705) 434-5338

Business Address:
Futurity Medical Clinic
Suite 305
745 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto ON  M4S 2N4
Phone Number: (416) 487-2052

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY ISAAC COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 03 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Nov 2015
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2013